MA S1867 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2569
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Humason (by request), a petition of Kirstin Beatty to reduce library non-ionizing radiation exposures from wireless and electricity. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Reducing library non-ionizing radiation exposures from wireless and electricity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2569 |
2019-09-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H587 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H3154 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H3154 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S185 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2569 (Replaced by) 2020-03-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1867 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1867.pdf |