MA S1862 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave for Marianne McVarish, an employee of the Department of Public Health. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Marianne McVarish, an employee of the Department of Public Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-09-26 | House | Enacted |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-09-26 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-09-25 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-09-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-09-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-09-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-09-23 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed), and passed to be engrossed |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2013-09-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-09-12 | House | House concurred |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Public Service |
2013-08-22 | Senate | Senate Rule 20 and Joint Rule 12 Suspended |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1862 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1862.pdf |