MA S185 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Accompanying a new draft, see S2173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent students from dropping out of school. Education.
Title
Preventing students from dropping out of school.
Sponsors
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Sen. Karen Spilka [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Senate | Accompanying a new draft, see S2173 |
2011-09-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education. |
2011-01-20 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S185 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13450&generalCourtId=1 |