MA S1849 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to rejuvenate restaurants. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to restaurant rejuvenation
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Petruccelli [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Dennis Rosa [D] | Sen. James Timilty [D] |
Sen. Thomas Kennedy [D] | Sen. Michael Knapik [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2011-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2011 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1849 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14089&generalCourtId=1 |