MA S1826 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2498
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to equitably support enhanced 911 service. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To equitably support enhanced 911 service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2498 |
2017-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2595 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2219 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H2134 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3759 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2631 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2205 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4605 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - New draft substituted, see H4617
H4617 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Published as amended, see H4639
H4639 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Committee of conference appointed (Welch-Lewis-Tarr), in concurrence
H2219 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H2134 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3759 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2631 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2205 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4605 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - New draft substituted, see H4617
H4617 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Published as amended, see H4639
H4639 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Committee of conference appointed (Welch-Lewis-Tarr), in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1826 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1826.pdf |