MA S1821 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 69-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to combat climate change. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Combating climate change

Sponsors

Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Frank Smizik [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. William Brownsberger [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Cory Atkins [D]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Byron Rushing [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Sen. Kenneth Donnelly [D]Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]
Sen. Adam Hinds [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]Rep. Diana DiZoglio [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Brendan Crighton [D]
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Joseph Boncore [D]
Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]Sen. Cynthia Creem [D]
Sen. Michael Rush [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]
Rep. Juana Matias [D]Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]Rep. Joan Meschino [D]Sen. John Keenan [D]
Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Sen. Cindy Friedman [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Sen. Linda Forry [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S453 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
S472 (Similar To) 2017-11-09 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
H3564 (Similar To) 2017-11-01 - New draft substituted, see H3994

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback