MA S1815 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 231 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 231 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to grant an easement at Rea's Pond Sewer Pump Station in the town of North Andover. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the granting of an easement at Rea's Pond Sewer Pump Station in the town of North Andover
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-05 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 231 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #455 [YEAS 38 - NAYS 0] |
2014-07-30 | House | Enacted 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 472) |
2014-07-30 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-11-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2013-10-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-10-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2013-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-07-18 | Senate receeded from its referral to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight and concurred in the referral to Municipalities and Regional Government | |
2013-07-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-07-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2013-07-15 | House | House NON-concurred in the reference to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1815 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1815.pdf |