MA S18 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-16 - Joint session held and dissolved
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-16 - Joint session held and dissolved
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposal for Constitutional Amendment Title: Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution requiring a supermajority vote for the utilization of rainy day funds By Mr. Tarr, a petition of Bruce E. Tarr, Richard J. Ross and Michael R. Knapik for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to require a supermajority vote for the utilization of rainy day funds. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution requiring a supermajority vote for the utilization of rainy day funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Joint | Joint session held and dissolved |
2014-03-12 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, July 16, 2014 |
2013-10-09 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, March 12, 2014 |
2013-05-08 | Joint | Joint session held and recessed to Wednesday, October 9, 2013 |
2013-05-06 | Joint | Called for consideration in the joint session |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on file |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on file |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass |
2013-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S18 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S18.pdf |