MA S1791 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4481
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide long term care to injured not at fault. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To provide long term care to injured not at fault
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4481 |
2017-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S342 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1622 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H508 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2885 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4611
H3204 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2630 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1794 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1783 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1788 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3573 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1622 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H508 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2885 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4611
H3204 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2630 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1794 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1783 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S1788 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H3573 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4481 (Replaced by) 2018-05-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1791 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1791.pdf |