MA S1785 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2349
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2349
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow certain online drives license notices. Transportation.
Title
Relative to drivers license notifications
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Daniel Winslow [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2349 |
2012-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2012 from 11:30 AM-02:30 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation. |
2011-01-20 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2349 (Replaced by) 2012-07-18 - Discharged to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1785 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8233&generalCourtId=1 |