MA S1765 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the observance of a Gold Star Wives Day and a Gold Star Mothers and Families Day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the observance of a Gold Star Wives Day and a Gold Star Mothers and Families Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S198 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4584
S1897 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1672 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1511 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1595 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
H1596 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1548 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1544 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1897 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1672 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1511 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1595 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
H1596 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1548 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1544 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4640
H4114 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1765 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1765.pdf |