MA S1760 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Resolution reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-25 - Resolution reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to recognize February 26 through March 4, 2017 as Eating Disorders Awareness Week in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Resolutions recognizing February 26 through March 4, 2017 as Eating Disorders Awareness Week in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Resolution reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1700 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1713 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2658 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2018
H1713 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2658 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 98 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1760 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1760.pdf |