MA S176 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4495
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4495
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4495
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sales tax holiday in August 2014. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Establishing a sales tax holiday in 2014
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4495 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-25 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4495 (Replaced by) 2014-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S176 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S176.pdf |