MA S173 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H243
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to regulate powdered alcohol. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Regulating powdered alcohol
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
Rep. Keiko Orrall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Accompanied by H243 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H243 (Replaces) 2016-02-04 - Accompanied S173
S1229 (Similar To) 2015-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1994
S1773 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1155 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2070
S644 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S775 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1105 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2110 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied H2109
H2927 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1101 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1229 (Similar To) 2015-08-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1994
S1773 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2388
S1155 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2070
S644 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S775 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1105 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2110 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied H2109
H2927 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1101 (Similar To) 2015-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S173 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S173.pdf |