MA S1721 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-04 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to place the word "veteran" on any eligible driver's license. Transportation.
Title
Relative to placing the word "veteran" on any eligible driver's license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Discharged to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means |
2012-02-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2012 from 11:30 AM-02:30 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1721 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7936&generalCourtId=1 |