MA S172 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to identity fraud. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to identity fraud
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2666 |
2021-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3521 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S727 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2131 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1026 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S727 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2131 (Similar To) 2022-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4933
S2540 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2086 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1026 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2282 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Amendment #1 () adopted
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S172 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S172.pdf |