MA S1705 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2252
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a disaster and emergency aid fund for Massachusetts artists
Title
Establishing a disaster and emergency aid fund for Massachusetts artists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2252 |
2011-05-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development. |
2011-01-19 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2252 (Replaced by) 2012-05-08 - Discharged to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1705 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12025&generalCourtId=1 |