MA S1670 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the transfer of boat registration between family members. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the transfer of boat registration between family members
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-08-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-08-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee recommended that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-02-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/05/2014 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2014-01-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/05/2014 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1670 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1670.pdf |