MA S1663 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2447
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2447
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create a grant program for municipal energy efficiency officers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Creating a grant program for municipal energy efficiency officers
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. William Brownsberger [D] | Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Rep. Paul Brodeur [D] |
Sen. Katherine Clark [D] | Rep. Steven Levy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2447 |
2012-03-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2447 (Replaced by) 2012-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1663 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11601&generalCourtId=1 |