MA S1656 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the state highway route 116 scenic byway. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the state highway route 116 scenic byway corridor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2013-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2013 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-11-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Transportation |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1656 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1656.pdf |