MA S1642 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to arson investigators. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to arson investigators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2341 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2861
H2599 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2625 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1788 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2599 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2625 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1788 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1642 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1642.pdf |