MA S1639 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2446
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2446
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create the Barnstable Yarmouth bike path. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the creation of the Barnstable Yarmouth bike path
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2446 |
2012-02-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/31/2012 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2011-03-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2011 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2011 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. |
2011-01-21 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2446 (Replaced by) 2012-10-04 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1639 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=14430&generalCourtId=1 |