MA S1621 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2931
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2931
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2931
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the employee rights of employees of the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the employee rights of employees of the Massachusetts Water Resources Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2931 |
2024-07-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-06-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4310 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4423 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4782 (Similar To) 2024-08-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2931 (Replaced by) 2024-08-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4423 (Similar To) 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4782 (Similar To) 2024-08-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2931 (Replaced by) 2024-08-15 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1621 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1621.pdf |