MA S1616 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to creditable service for elected officials. Public Service.
Title
Relative to creditable service for elected officials
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S440 (Similar To) 2023-12-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2608 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H2597 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H3983 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H4125 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H2608 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H2597 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
H3983 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
H4125 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1616 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1616.pdf |