MA S161 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect biometric information under the security breach law. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to protecting biometric information under the security breach law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2666 |
2021-09-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S220 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2666 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S161 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S161.pdf |