MA S1605 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2290

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to a small business gas tax credit. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a small business gas tax credit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2290
2015-04-23JointHearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1547 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1446 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S232 (Similar To) 2016-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2134
S1480 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S2145 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1418 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback