MA S1583 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to tax abatements for deaf residents. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tax abatements for deaf residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | Accompanied S1503 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1526 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1555 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1610 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1500 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3309 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
S1503 (Replaced by) 2017-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2124
H1555 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1610 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1500 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3309 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
S1503 (Replaced by) 2017-07-27 - New draft substituted, see S2124
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1583 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1583.pdf |