MA S157 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sales tax holiday in August 2012. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
To establish a sales tax holiday August 2012.
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-07-19 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-06-20 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass, rules suspended and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Recommitted to the committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 1, 2012 |
2011-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2011 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in 222 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S157 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13784&generalCourtId=1 |