MA S1567 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3324
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify occupancy excise and internet hotel room resellers. Revenue.
Title
Clarifying occupancy excise and internet hotel room resellers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-06-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-05 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2017-05-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-05-04 | House | Accompanied by H3324 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1605 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S103 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1556 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1535 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
S1616 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3917
H1541 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3663
H1611 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1490 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3324 (Replaces) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied S1567
H1607 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3707 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H3702 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H2726 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S103 (Similar To) 2017-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S1556 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1535 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
S1616 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3917
H1541 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3663
H1611 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1490 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3324 (Replaces) 2017-05-04 - Accompanied S1567
H1607 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3707 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H3702 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H2726 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1567 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1567.pdf |