MA S1558 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to public safety on private college and university campuses. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to public safety on private college and university campuses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-09-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/13/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1522 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1558 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1558.pdf |