MA S1541 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday, July 17th, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to strengthen visitation rights of incarcerated people. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To strengthen visitation rights of incarcerated people

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-15SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday, July 17th, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-25HouseHouse concurred
2024-04-16SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-04-04HouseHouse concurred
2024-03-25SenateReporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-01-16JointHearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1499 (Similar To) 2024-05-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2357 (Similar To) 2024-06-20 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback