MA S1521 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a primary seat belt law. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Establishing a primary seat belt law
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H4544 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1521 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1521.pdf |