MA S1517 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide automated external defibrillators in all public safety vehicles. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To provide automated external defibrillators in all public safety vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2298 (Similar To) 2024-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4877
H4972 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4972 (Similar To) 2024-08-05 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1517 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1517.pdf |