MA S1511 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide criminal justice reform protections to all prisoners in segregated confinement. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To provide criminal justice reform protections to all prisoners in segregated confinement
Sponsors
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Liz Miranda [D] | Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] |
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Erika Uyterhoeven [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/23/2024 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2481 (Similar To) 2023-10-26 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2491
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2491 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1511 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1511.pdf |