MA S1508 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1883
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S1883
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S1883
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to lease or sell the National Guard armory in the city of Worcester. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to lease or sell the National Guard armory in the city of Worcester
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Harriette Chandler [D] | Rep. John Binienda [D] | Rep. John Fresolo [D] |
Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Harold Naughton [D] | Rep. John Mahoney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S1883 |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Accompanying a study order, see S1883 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 08/19/2013 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM in 222 |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2013-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1883 (Replaced by) 2013-10-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1508 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1508.pdf |