MA S1505 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2441

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to encourage a better business climate and job creation in the Commonwealth. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging a better business climate and job creation in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-20SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2441
2011-10-20JointHearing scheduled for 10/27/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
2011-01-24HouseHouse concurred.
2011-01-24SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Revenue.
2011-01-21SenateBill Filed.

Same As/Similar To

S2441 (Replaced by) 2012-09-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback