MA S1489 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4143
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to recognize the flag of the former Republic of Vietnam. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To recognize the flag of the former Republic of Vietnam
Sponsors
Sen. John Hart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4143 |
2013-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4143 (Replaced by) 2014-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1489 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1489.pdf |