MA S1486 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied H1386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied H1386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend disability or death caused by certain conditions of cancer. Public Service.
Title
Relative to amending disability or death caused by certain conditions of cancer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Accompanied H1386 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1196 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
H1386 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3242 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1446 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3279 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4260
H1399 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H1222 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1386 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3242 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1446 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3279 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4260
H1399 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H1222 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1486 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1486.pdf |