MA S1485 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2082
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Ways and Means new draft substituted, see S2082
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Ways and Means new draft substituted, see S2082
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant a sewer easement in certain land in the town of Tewksbury. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance to grant a sewer easement in certain land in the town of Tewksbury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ways and Means new draft substituted, see S2082 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Read second |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2082 |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 08/19/2013 from 10:00 AM-11:00 AM in 222 |
2013-07-11 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2013-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2082 (Replaced by) 2014-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 213 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S1485 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S1485.pdf |