MA S1475 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2648

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish the Lead Poisoning Prevention Trust Fund. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Lead Poisoning Prevention Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2648
2023-09-25JointHearing scheduled for 10/05/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H2280 (Similar To) 2024-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2578
S2648 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2833 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback