MA S147 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation further regulating the continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and salespersons. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Further regulating the continuing education requirements for real estate brokers and salespersons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-06-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S598 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H938 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S196 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H355 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H288 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H938 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S196 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H355 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H288 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S147 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S147.pdf |