MA S1457 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Accompanied H2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-26 - Accompanied H2318
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to improve access to family physicians. Public Health.
Title
To improve access to family physicians
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-26 | House | Accompanied H2318 |
2022-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Saturday December 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H2318 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S312 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S293 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
S384 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S312 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S293 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1457 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1457.pdf |