MA S1457 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2505
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2505
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the reform of the Executive Council
Title
Relative to the reform of the Executive Council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Accompanied a new draft, see S2505 | |
2010-04-05 | Reporting date extended to Saturday, May 15, 2010 | |
2009-01-20 | House concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S2505 (Replaced by) 2011-01-04 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/Senate/S1457 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=2839&generalCourtId=2 |