MA S1455 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to essential health services. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to essential health services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-18HouseHouse concurred
2024-04-16SenateReporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-27JointHearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16HouseHouse concurred
2023-02-16SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S1466 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback