MA S1444 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2441
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2441
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the filing of tax abatement applications by persons claiming to represent taxpayers, tenants, or mortgage holders. Revenue.
Title
Relative to authorized abatement applications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2441 |
2011-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2011-01-14 | Senate | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
S2441 (Replaced by) 2012-09-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1444 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8019&generalCourtId=1 |