MA S1421 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2648
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to combat V.I.P. syndrome to protect health care integrity and quality. Public Health.
Title
To combat V.I.P. syndrome to protect health care integrity and quality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2648 |
2023-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2648 (Replaced by) 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1421 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1421.pdf |