MA S142 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4042
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to price discrepancies in gas station purchases . Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to price discrepancies in gas station purchases
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Rush [D] | Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Christopher Fallon [D] |
Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D] | Rep. William Pignatelli [D] | Rep. Thomas Golden [D] | Rep. Denise Andrews [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4042 |
2013-11-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4042 (Replaced by) 2014-06-16 - Reported, in part, by H3636
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S142 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S142.pdf |