MA S1415 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to birthing justice in the Commonwealth. Public Health.
Title
Relative to birthing justice in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S782 (Similar To) 2023-08-28 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H4094 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - House concurred
H4143 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2496 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2521 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H4094 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - House concurred
H4143 (Similar To) 2023-11-28 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2496 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2521 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1415 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1415.pdf |