MA S1409 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to death benefits to surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters. Public Service.
Title
Relative to death benefits to surviving spouses of call and volunteer firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2017-11-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1536 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1386 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2018
S1391 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1488 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
H1566 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1443 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1392 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1455 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3289 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1849 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1865 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H2447 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4955 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 365 of the Acts of 2018
S1386 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2018
S1391 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1488 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1537 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
H1566 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1536
H1385 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1443 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1392 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1455 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3289 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1849 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1865 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H2447 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4955 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 365 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1409 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1409.pdf |