MA S140 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4299
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to partial payments. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to partial payments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4299 |
2019-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2565 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S625 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2804
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
H4209 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 283 of the Acts of 2020
H4299 (Replaced by) 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S625 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2804
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
H4209 (Similar To) 2021-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 283 of the Acts of 2020
H4299 (Replaced by) 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S140 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S140.pdf |